|
| |
Caption: Board of Trustees Minutes - 1942 This is a reduced-resolution page image for fast online browsing.
EXTRACTED TEXT FROM PAGE:
I941] UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 657 SCHMIDT, Mrs. RUTH, Assistant Stenographer in the Radio Station—resignation effective August 31, 1941. SHAVER, SYLVIA HARDING, Order Assistant in the Library—resignation effective October 1, 1941. SINGER, M O R S E BERVL, J R . , Assistant Mechanician in the Shop Laboratories, in t h e Department of Mechanical Engineering, in the College of Engineering— declination effective September 1, 1941. SLOBODKIN, MARTIN H., Scholar in Political Science—resignation effective September I, 1941. SMITH, JAMES H E N R Y , Instructor in Electrical Engineering, in the College of Engineering—declination effective September 1, 1941. SMITH, LAURENCE L E W I S , Associate in Electrical Engineering, in the College of Engineering—declination effective September 1, 1941. SMITH, N E T T I E M A R I E , Junior Stenographer in the Bursar's Division of the Business Office—declination effective September 1, 1941. SPINDLER, ROBERT H A L E , Assistant in the Loan Department of the Library— resignation effective September 12, 1941. STASTNV, A N N J U N E , Stenographer in the Department of Agricultural Economics, in the Agricultural Experiment Station—resignation effective September 1, 1941. STILLMAN, MIRIAM, Senior Clerk in the Purchasing Division of the Chicago Business Office—cancellation effective September 1, 1941. STRAW, SYLVESTER BYRON, Assistant in the Classics—resignation effective September 1, 1941. STRICKER, THOMAS ALLISON, Assistant in Physiology—declination effective September 1, 1941. STROBEL, CHARLES FREDERICK, Instructor in Mathematics—declination effec- tive September 1, 1941. THOMPSON, Mrs. MADELINE CORD, Reference Assistant in the Library—declina- tion effective September 1, 1941. TRAVIS, JAMES RICHARD, Assistant in English—cancellation effective July 1,1941. TRESHAM, WILLIAM H., Scholar in Accountancy—declination effective September 1, 1941. WAGAR, UNA PAULINE, Instructor in Music—declination effective September 1, 1941. WARREN, WILLIAM JOSEPH, Associate in Electrical Engineering, in the College of Engineering—declination effective September 1, 1941. W E R T S , Mrs. ELIZABETH HUDSON, Clerk and Stenographer in the Department of Civil Engineering, in the College of Engineering, and in the Engineering Experiment Station—declination effective September 1, 1941. WILLIAMSON, LELAND WILLIAM, Assistant Storekeeper in the Office Supply Storeroom—declination effective September 1, 1941. WOLF, FRANK JAMES, Assistant in Chemistry—declination effective September 1, 1941. WOLF, RONALD H., Fellow in Economics—declination effective September 1, 1941. W R E N N , HOWARD MONTGOMERY, Assistant in Animal Husbandry, in the College of Agriculture, and in the Agricultural Experiment Station—declination effective September 1, 1941. WRIGHT, WILSON LOWRY, Assistant in Animal Husbandry, in the College of Agriculture, and in the Agricultural Experiment Station—declination effective September i, 1941. ZIMMERMAN, WILLIAM H U I E T , J R . , Assistant in Music—declination effective September 1, 1941. The Board adjourned, to meet on call of the President. H. E. CUNNINGHAM JAMES M. CLEARY Secretary President
| |