|
| |
Caption: Board of Trustees Minutes - 1958 This is a reduced-resolution page image for fast online browsing.
EXTRACTED TEXT FROM PAGE:
Il6 BOARD OF TRUSTEES [October 22 3. REID O. ENGELMANN, Clinical Assistant Professor of Surgery, in the College of Medicine, without salary, and Assistant Professor of Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery and Director of Hospital Oral Surgery, in the College of Dentistry, beginning September 10, 1956, at an annual salary of $6,400 (DY80). 4. KAROL J. KociMSKl, Visiting Professor of Architecture, beginning October I5> 1956, at an annual salary of $7,800 ( D ) . 5. RICHARD C. KOHLER, Assistant Professor of General Engineering, Chicago Undergraduate Division, beginning September 1, 1956, at an annual salary of $5,600 ( B ) . 6. EARL L. LASLEY, Associate Professor of Animal Science, in the College of Agriculture and in the Agricultural Experiment Station, beginning November 1, 1956, at an annual salary of $8,200 ( A Y ) . 7. EUGENE C. PAIGE, JR., Assistant Professor of Mathematics, beginning September 1, 1956, at an annual salary of $5400 ( D ) . 8. SEYMOUR L. POLLACK, Clinical Assistant Professor of Neurology, in the Department of Neurology and Neurological Surgery, beginning September !5. 1956, without salary ( D Y ) . 9. CLIFTON C. RHEAD, Clinical Assistant Professor of Psychiatry, beginning September 1, 1956, without salary ( D Y ) . A p p o i n t m e n t s t o N o n a c a d e m i c Staff T h e Director of Nonacademic Personnel reports the following appointments to a supervisory position of upper level responsibility. 1. MELVIN P . SALAVITCH, Assistant Tabulating Machine Supervisor, Chicago Business Office, beginning August 21, 1956, at an annual salary of $5,100. 2. M R S . MARGUERITE M. SPIZZIRRI, Food Service Supervisor, Research and Educational Hospitals, beginning August 27, 1956, at an annual salary of $3,720. O n m o t i o n of M r . H e r r i c k , t h e s e a p p o i n t m e n t s w e r e c o n f i r m e d . INSTITUTE OF LABOR AND INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS ADVISORY COMMITTEE (6) T h e Director of the Institute of Labor and Industrial Relations recommends the following appointments to the Institute's Advisory Committee for a term of three years beginning September 1, 1956: Management JOHN HUNDLEY, Director, Industrial Relations and Personnel, Granite City Steel Company, Granite City, Illinois. HERMAN SEINWERTH, Director, Industrial Relations, Swift and Company, Chicago, Illinois. WILLIAM MILLER, Vice-President, Stewart-Warner Corporation, Chicago, Illinois. These appointments replace Messrs. Robert Ryan, Manager-Manufacturing, H o t Point Company, Chicago Heights, and E. G. Kasch, General Personnel Manager, Kraft Foods Company, Chicago, whose terms have expired, and Donald H . Tilson, formerly W o r k s Manager of the Aluminum Company of America, in East St. Louis, who resigned when he moved out of the state. Labor R A Y PASNICK, Publicity and Education Representative, United Steelworkers of America, Chicago, Illinois. PETER HOBAN, President, Milk Wagon Drivers Union, Local No. 753, Chicago, Illinois. These appointments replace Messrs. Stephen M. Bailey, Business Manager, Chicago Journeymen Plumbers, A F of L, Chicago, and Lloyd McBride, Representative, United Steelworkers of America, CIO, Granite City, whose terms have expired. Public PETER KELLIHER, Labor-Management Arbitrator, 77 West Washington Street, Chicago, Illinois. SAMUEL C. BERNSTEIN, Commissioner, Division of Unemployment Compensation, State of Illinois, Chicago, Illinois.
| |