|
| |
Caption: Board of Trustees Minutes - 1942 This is a reduced-resolution page image for fast online browsing.
EXTRACTED TEXT FROM PAGE:
730 BOARD O F T R U S T E E S [December 16 Business Office, for eight months beginning January I, 1942, subject to the rules of the Civil Service Commission, at a salary at the rate of one hundred five dollars ($105) a month (this supersedes her previous appointment). (December 13, 1941) TARLOW, VIRGINIA, Assistant in Psychiatry, in the College of Medicine, beginning December I, 1941, and continuing through August 31, 1942, without salary. (December 3, 1941) WESSELS, MARIE, Assistant in Medicine, in the College of Medicine, for ten months beginning November 1, 1941, without salary. (November 24, 1041) WORTHINGTON, MAJOR HENRY, Superintendent of the Dispensary, in the College of Medicine, and Superintendent of the Research and Educational Hospital, for one year beginning September 1, 1941, at a salary of five thousand three hundred dollars ($5,300) (this supersedes his previous appointment). (November 17, 1941) DECLINATIONS AND RESIGNATIONS T h e S e c r e t a r y p r e s e n t e d a l s o f o r r e c o r d t h e f o l l o w i n g list o f d e c l i n a tions a n d resignations. AUSTIN, MARGARET H . , Assistant Professor of Medicine ( R u s h ) , in the College of Medicine—declination effective September 1, 1941. BERGQUIST, ARTHUR VALENTINE, Assistant in Anatomy, in the College of Medicine—declination effective October 1, 1941. BRIGGS, FRANCES A., Instructor in Physiological Chemistry, in the College of Medicine—resignation effective December 1, 1941. COOK, VIRGINIA GRACE, Continuity Writer in the Radio Station—resignation effective December 1, 1941. CORBETT, WILLARD JASON, First Assistant in Dairy Husbandry, in the Agricultural Experiment Station—resignation effective January 1, 1942. HENRY, VELMA LUCILLE, Assistant in Spanish—resignation effective December 1, 1941. KARABIN, JOHN EDWARD, Assistant in Surgery, in the College of Medicine— declination effective September 1, 1941. KRIEG, AMELIA, Assistant Director of the Library School and Assistant P r o fessor of Library Science—resignation effective January 10, 1942. K U H N S , RALPH HENRY, Instructor in Psychiatry, in the College of Medicine —declination effective September I, 1941. NEIMAN, IRWIN SAMUEL, Instructor in Bacteriology and Public Health, in the Department of Pathology, Bacteriology, and Public Health, in the College of Medicine—resignation effective November 17, 1941. OXTOBY, FRED B., Assistant in Library Science in the Library School— resignation effective December 17, 1941. POSTON, CHARLES FRANCIS, Assistant in Economics—resignation effective December 1, 1041. STUART, CARROLL W., Instructor in Bacteriology and Public Health, in the Department of Pathology, Bacteriology, and Public Health, in the College of Medicine—declination effective September 1, 1941. TARLOW, VIRGINIA, First Year Resident in the Department of Psychiatry, in the College of Medicine—resignation effective December 1, 1941. UNDERWOOD, H E L E N ELIZABETH, Assistant in Institution Management, in the Department of H o m e Economics, in t h e College of Agriculture—resignation effective February 1, 1042. WAGER, RALPH WALDO, Assistant Professor of Vegetable Crops Extension, in the Department of Horticulture, in the Extension Service in Agriculture and H o m e Economics—resignation effective at the close of business November 8,1941. T h e B o a r d a d j o u r n e d , t o m e e t a t t h e C h i c a g o HHni U n i o n ing at 9 : 3 0 a.m. o n T u e s d a y , D e c e m b e r 30, 1941. Build- H. E. C U N N I N G H A M JAMES M. CLEARY Secretary President
| |