|
| |
Caption: Board of Trustees Minutes - 1988 This is a reduced-resolution page image for fast online browsing.
EXTRACTED TEXT FROM PAGE:
BOARD OF TRUSTEES Member Ex Officio JAMES R. THOMPSON, Governor of Illinois, Springfield 62706 Elected Members (Term 1983-89) WILLIAM D . FORSYTH, J R . , 1201 South Fourth Street, Springfield 62703 GEOROE W. HOWARD I I I , Howard Building-Box U , M t . Vernon 62864 ALBERT N . LOGAN, 9400 Soudi Pamell Avenue, Chicago 60620 (Term 1985-91) SUSAN L. GRAVENHORST, 1844 Knollwood Road, Lake Forest 60045 RALPH C. HAHN, 1320 South State Street, Springfield 62704 ANN E. SMITH, 180 North LaSalle Street, Suite 1700, Chicago 60601 (Resigned July 15, 1988) PAUL R. CICERO, 308 N. Highland, Rockford 61107 (August 1, 1988-January 8, 1989) GLORIA JACKSON BACON, 6910 South Bennett Avenue, Chicago 60649 (January 9, 1988-1991) (Term 1987-93) JUDITH ANN CALDER, 185 Franklin Road, Glencoe 60022 NINA T . SHEPHERD, 256 Scott Lane, Winnetka 60093 CHARLES P. WOLFF, 107 South Melrose, Elgin 60123 Nonvoting Student Members (Term 1986-87) EDWARD C. STARKESON, Chicago Campus MARK R. FILD?, Urbana-Champaign Campus (Term 1987-88) JAMES L. EVENSON, Chicago Campus ROBERT SCOTT WYLIE, Urbana-Champaign Campus Officers of the Board GEORGE W. HOWARD I I I , President, M t . Vernon EARL W. PORTER, Secretary, U r b a n a CRAIG S. BAZZANI, Comptroller, U r b a n a BERNARD T . WALL, Treasurer, Chicago BYRON H . HicorNS, University Counsel, Urbana Executive Committee GEORGE W. HOWARD I I I , Chairman, RALPH C. HAHN, ALBERT N . LOGAN vu
| |