|
| |
Caption: Board of Trustees Minutes - 1910 This is a reduced-resolution page image for fast online browsing.
EXTRACTED TEXT FROM PAGE:
528 UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS. [April 12 Meeting of April 12, 1910. A special meeting of the Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois was held at the LaSalle hotel, in Chicago, April 12,-1910, pursuant to the following notice which was sent out by the secretary, April 6, 1910: Upon the call of the president, Mr. W. L. Abbott, there will be a special meeting of the Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois at 12:00 m., Tuesday, April 12, 1910, at the La Salle Hotel, in Chicago, to receive a report from the State Architect on bids received for the construction of Lfincoln Hall, and to consider his recommendations for awarding a contract for the same, to receive reports from special and standing committees, and to consider such matters as may be duly presented by the officials of the University. When the board met pursuant to this call, the following ^ members were present: Messrs. Abbott, Blair, Crebs, Davison, Grout, Hatch and Moore, and Mrs. Evans and Mrs. Busey; absent, Governor Deneen and Mr. Meeker, and Mrs. Bahrenburg. President James was present. The secretary presented the minutes of the meeting of March 8, 1910, and*they were approved on motion of Mr. Moore. APPOINTMENTS. The secretary presented the following report of appointments not previously reported: Florence L. Brundage, order assistant in the Library, in place of Miss O'Brien, resigned, at a salary of $60.00 a month, from April 1, 1910, to Aug. 31, 1910. Reba Davis, assistant in the Loan Department in place of Miss Brundage, at a salary of $55.00 a month from April 1, 1910, to July 31, 1910. Carmen F. Harnack, clerk and stenographer in the office of the Water Survey from April 1, 1910, to July 1, 1910, at a salary of $40.00 a month, in place of A. C. Wilkins, resigned Feb. 1, 1910. Sarah M. Slater, clerk in the Department of Mechanical Engineering, at a salary of $50.00 a month, beginning Apr. 1, 1910, in place of Myrtle B. Hungerford, resigned. ADVISORY BOARD OF SCHOOL OF PHARMACY. In accordance with authority given (see page 199 Board Minutes, July 14, 1909) Mr. E. L. Ladish, of Chicago, has been appointed a member of the Advisory Board of the School of Pharmacy for the term expiring July 1, 1914.
| |